Accounts and annual returns ASHBY AND COALVILLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 15 January 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 15 January 2021 17 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 14 January 2020 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 01 March 2020 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 20 February 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 20 February 2019 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 09 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window