Trustees ASHBY AND COALVILLE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter William Clifton Trustee 15 October 2020
1st Moira and Blackfordby Scouts
Received: On time
Louise Elizabeth Bailey Trustee 15 October 2020
1ST DONISTHORPE SCOUT GROUP
Received: 78 days late
Richard Bryan Nevin Trustee 15 October 2020
None on record
Philip Jonathan Bloor Trustee 20 June 2019
LEICESTERSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
4TH ASHBY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Susan Mitchell Trustee 20 June 2019
None on record
Peter Bailey Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
Stephen Pope Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
CHRISTINE BEEBY Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Martin Farrar Trustee 02 August 2014
1ST THRINGSTONE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
4TH COALVILLE SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
1ST DONISTHORPE SCOUT GROUP
Received: 78 days late
richard derek moore Trustee 02 August 2014
None on record
Duncan Keith Watts Trustee 02 August 2014
None on record