Financial history Harborough District Scout Council

Charity number: 521764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £104.90k £68.63k £53.94k £44.40k £57.92k
Total expenditure £105.64k £85.06k £56.92k £34.68k £44.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A