Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521824
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.83k £1.83k £1.83k £2.55k £1.83k
Total expenditure £1.51k £1.51k £1.61k £2.20k £1.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A