CRANWELL AND BYARDS LEAP VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £14.75k £14.57k £14.64k £20.32k £4.76k
Total expenditure £12.14k £17.34k £12.41k £10.57k £11.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k N/A