Accounts and annual returns CARRINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 31 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 17 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 07 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required