Accounts and annual returns ASHINGTON UNIT 12 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 October 2021 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 April 2020 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 April 2020 439 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required