Trustees ASHINGTON UNIT 12 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Charity number: 522028
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Michael Grant | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Sarah Maughan | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Smith | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN LAVERICK | Trustee | 02 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Tait | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kerrie Hall | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.