CHOPPINGTON SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £114.34k £120.43k £98.47k £101.24k £98.26k
Total expenditure £115.77k £115.03k £120.57k £138.00k £131.67k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A