Accounts and annual returns WALKERVILLE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 12 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 August 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 August 2020 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 22 August 2019 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required