BILSTHORPE MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 522185
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 19 July 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)