BILSTHORPE MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 522185
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A £25.00k
Other income £34.57k £34.96k £52.82k £44.22k £57.46k
Total expenditure £52.40k £43.78k £48.40k £50.06k £46.95k