COTGRAVE SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522205
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £94.23k £91.39k £84.01k £98.86k £34.75k
Total expenditure £108.37k £93.04k £86.59k £72.70k £25.16k
Income from government contracts £3.84k £1.80k £1.80k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £50 £150 N/A £20.19k