Accounts and annual returns MANSFIELD COLLIERY MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522247
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window