LONGDEN TERRACE MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522318
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 April 2021 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 27 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 31 October 2016 On time Download