Financial history 18TH GAINSBOROUGH GROUP OF SCOUTS (ST NICHOLAS HAXEY)

Charity number: 522380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.67k £9.75k £14.36k £18.58k £8.23k
Total expenditure £6.82k £9.59k £9.30k £16.11k £6.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A