Trustees THE LINCOLNSHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 522395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Philip Newlove | Chair | 30 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Amy Constance Roberts | Trustee | 16 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Duncan Campbell | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||
SHARON WENDY AUMAIS | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cindy Joy Lee | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tom Alexander Walton | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Christopher Henry | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Simeon Wand | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ellie Robyn Broome | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Louise Gilbert | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Claire Greig | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Peter Dominic Williams | Trustee | 10 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Burt | Trustee | 12 June 1994 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.