Trustees ERCALL MAGNA, PAYTON RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL
Charity Number: 522519

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sandra Noyes Thomas | Chair | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Grant | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Harrison | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Grant | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Fancett | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MR A WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
RAY WICKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.