Accounts and annual returns TELFORD UNIT 405 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required