Accounts and annual returns ASHLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 522600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 21 September 2019 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 05 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required