AUNT PHOEBE'S RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522958
Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required