AUNT PHOEBE'S RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 522958
Charity reporting is overdue by 326 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £113 £6 £0 £129 £10
Total expenditure £0 £50 £0 £118 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A