Trustees GRIFF & COTON SPORTS & MINERS WELFARE CHARITY
Charity number: 522976
Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis Wilson | Chair | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Melvin Moore | Trustee | 20 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Paul Masters | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Terence Tyman | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wetton | Trustee | 24 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dean LLoyd | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin John Crutchlow | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robin Leslie Jefferies | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Calvert | Trustee | 16 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Terry Twigger | Trustee | 26 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.