Financial history SUTTON COLDFIELD UNIT 42 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 523023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £52.78k £68.48k £40.59k £59.67k £27.15k
Total expenditure £66.31k £64.44k £30.82k £55.82k £29.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £6.54k £14.00k £14.00k