Financial history LLANRHYSTYD MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 523374
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.35k £6.67k £4.57k £5.01k £14.99k
Total expenditure £3.88k £4.94k £8.80k £3.90k £3.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.00k