ASKERN MINERS WELFARE HALL, SPORTS AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523474
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £83.33k £76.24k £23.43k £15.91k £14.48k
Total expenditure £39.81k £77.04k £41.37k £26.33k £21.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A