CARCROFT SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523535
Charity reporting is overdue by 1762 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 301 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 667 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1032 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1032 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1397 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1397 days
Annual return 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1762 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1762 days