CARCROFT SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523535
Charity reporting is overdue by 1763 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £164 £214 £217 £126 £105
Total expenditure £10.57k £10.93k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A