Financial history FOXHILL AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523608
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £50.75k £46.96k £40.24k £89.74k £58.35k
Total expenditure £42.12k £45.33k £42.48k £78.13k £53.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £37.15k