Accounts and annual returns VILLAGE HALL, READING ROOM AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 February 2018 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required