Financial history VILLAGE HALL, READING ROOM AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523695
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.33k £27.71k £6.54k £6.67k £23.85k
Total expenditure £5.50k £27.85k £6.88k £5.91k £3.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.00k N/A N/A £23.00k