Accounts and annual returns GARDEN VILLAGE WELFARE ASSOCIATION (CROSS GATES)

Charity number: 523750
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 477 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 477 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 843 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 843 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required