Financial history GARDEN VILLAGE WELFARE ASSOCIATION (CROSS GATES)

Charity number: 523750
Charity reporting is overdue by 847 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £16.97k £17.10k £18.56k £20.28k £13.32k
Total expenditure £21.01k £13.58k £17.80k £18.85k £12.79k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 £0