Accounts and annual returns LANGSETT ROAD YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 523907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required