Financial history CLUB 66 BOYS CLUB

Charity number: 523909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £78.47k £54.95k £35.79k £38.41k £45.95k
Total expenditure £36.04k £86.10k £29.41k £25.68k £23.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A