Financial history MITCHELL AND DARFIELD MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.14k £12.94k £14.02k £10.74k £13.84k
Total expenditure £13.14k £12.94k £14.02k £10.74k £13.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.35k £12.15k £13.61k £10.53k £13.81k