Financial history LLANARMON DYFFRYN CEIRIOG VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 524054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £3.21k £5.44k £3.54k £3.63k £11.41k
Total expenditure £5.78k £5.26k £6.94k £5.60k £4.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k