THE WATTSTOWN SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 524239
Charity reporting is overdue by 5 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 5 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 06 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 12 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required