Financial history 1ST OMBERSLEY COMPANY OF GIRL GUIDES

Charity number: 524634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.15k £1.34k £1.72k £1.71k £11.67k
Total expenditure £910 £1.03k £4.25k £2.39k £5.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A