21ST WEST HULL (ST MARTIN'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 December 2020 317 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required