Trustees 1ST BEN RHYDDING SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 524756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN WILLIAMS | Chair | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Holmes | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Connolly | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Moffatt | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walton | Trustee | 02 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Carter | Trustee | 23 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Evans | Trustee | 26 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Phillips | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILCOCK | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BYRNE | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hindmarsh | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATY WILBY | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
GWYN WILCOCK | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
LUCINDA WARNES | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW CARTER | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
SIMON BOYLE | Trustee | 24 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHARPE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BASTOW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBIN BEAUMONT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEIDI BEARDSMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.