15TH AIREDALE (ST OSWALD'S) SCOUT GROUP GUISELEY, LEEDS

Charity number: 524809
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £19.69k £20.88k £22.05k £16.69k £20.06k
Total expenditure £19.24k £18.63k £18.37k £12.59k £21.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k