2ND ACOMB (ST STEPHEN'S) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 February 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 February 2017 24 days late Download