2ND ST THOMAS (YORK) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.63k £5.81k £4.93k £4.93k £3.93k
Total expenditure £7.79k £6.04k £5.37k £4.54k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A