1ST CAERNARVON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.36k £2.64k £2.10k £2.12k £230
Total expenditure £5.80k £1.86k £1.68k £1.94k £640
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A