Accounts and annual returns 1ST RUTHIN BRYNBACH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 March 2021 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 March 2021 425 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required