Financial history 1ST RUTHIN BRYNBACH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524872
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £14.09k £13.36k £15.33k £10.62k £715
Total expenditure £11.44k £12.76k £11.21k £8.54k £7.56k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A