ST MARY'S COLLEGE TRUST

Charity number: 525787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £44.36k £49.51k £49.51k £47.14k £41.87k
Total expenditure £50.82k £55.30k £55.30k £58.28k £22.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A