THE QUERNMORE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £278 £5.58k £270 £11.27k £3.01k
Total expenditure £350 £420 £210 £280 £18.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A