THE QUERNMORE EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 526341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN FOX Trustee 12 July 2013 None on record
Garwood Kelsall Trustee 10 November 2013 None on record
TRACEY PARKINSON Trustee 30 June 2013 None on record
Harriet Mary MacArthur Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Ruth Yvonne Harris Trustee 18 February 2019 None on record